Christina Nguyen,
John Quach,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
Shaun Anthony Tramondo,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with John C. Gastelum presiding.
Case Details for
Christina Nguyen v. Shaun Anthony Tramondo
, et al.
Case Events for
Christina Nguyen v. Shaun Anthony Tramondo
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
September 23, 2024
Hearing
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DE LA CRUZ
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: John C. Gastelum
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13400525 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13228716.
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 31462477 RECEIVED ON 04/16/2024 10:05:41 AM.
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY QUACH, JOHN; NGUYEN, CHRISTINA ON 04/16/2024
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE ON 04/16/2024.
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUACH, JOHN; NGUYEN, CHRISTINA ON 04/16/2024