April Gates,
filed a(n)
Petitions - Other
case
against
Mercury Insurance Company,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Layne H. Melzer presiding.
Case Details for
April Gates v. Mercury Insurance Company
The text is a petition to compel arbitration filed by the Shawn Steel Law Firm on behalf of April Gates against Mercury Insurance Company. The petition states that April Gates was involved in an automobile collision and sustained damages and injuries...
Case Events for
April Gates v. Mercury Insurance Company
Date
Type
Description
October 05, 2023
Hearing
MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Judge: SUPERVISING
October 02, 2023
Docket Event
PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
October 02, 2023
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GATES, APRIL ON 10/02/2023
October 02, 2023
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
October 02, 2023
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41550034 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2023 03:05:22 PM.
July 28, 2023
Docket Event
MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Layne H. Melzer
July 28, 2023
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 21343146 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2023 09:28:06 AM.
July 28, 2023
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13259861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13088009.
July 25, 2023
Docket Event
PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY GATES, APRIL ON 07/25/2023
July 25, 2023
Docket Event
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SUPERVISING ON 07/25/2023.