Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Gene Goziker, filed a(n) Fraud case against Anna Kim, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Craig L. Griffin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2023 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
This complaint alleges that the defendant, Anna Kim, an attorney, committed perjury on multiple occasions while under oath in a family law case. The plaintiff, Gene Goziker, claims that Anna Kim knowingly made false statements regarding the plaintiff...
COMPLAINT FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 04/07/2023
Date: April 07, 2023NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 04/07/2023
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 04/07/2023
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 04/07/2023
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 04/07/2023
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER) FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 06/27/2023
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KIM, ANNA ON 05/19/2023
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KIM, ANNA ON 05/19/2023
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 06/27/2023
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KIM, ANNA ON 09/05/2023
Date: September 05, 2023REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 09/01/2023
Date: September 01, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KIM, ANNA ON 08/24/2023
Date: August 24, 2023REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY GOZIKER, GENE ON 07/13/2023
Date: 2023-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.