Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Miguel Mendez Martinez, People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Layne H. Melzer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2023 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2023 11:35:00 AM.
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00PETITION - OTHER (FOR FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY) FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 03/27/2023
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL) FILED BY MARTINEZ, MIGUEL MENDEZ ON 06/05/2023
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2023CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE > 5000 FILED BY MARTINEZ, MIGUEL MENDEZ ON 03/10/2023
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/06/2023 01:57:00 PM.
Date: September 06, 2023STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 09/06/2023
Date: September 06, 2023MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/05/2023 09:30:00 AM.
Date: June 06, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.