Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jonah Arthur Simon, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Layne H. Melzer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/06/2023
Date: February 03, 2023CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMON, JONAH ARTHUR ON 02/02/2023
Date: February 02, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2023PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER FILED BY SIMON, JONAH ARTHUR ON 02/02/2023
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: February 06, 2023DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023.
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY SIMON, JONAH ARTHUR ON 04/14/2023
Date: April 14, 2023NAME CHANGE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY SIMON, JONAH ARTHUR ON 02/02/2023
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.