Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mariam Bishara, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against Altamed Health Services Corp., Superior Court Of The State Of Califor, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Layne H. Melzer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2022 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
PETITION FOR WRIT SCHEDULED FOR 12/22/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: November 30, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BISHARA, MARIAM ON 11/30/2022
Date: November 30, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION FOR WRIT 12/22/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/18/2022
Date: November 18, 2022PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY BISHARA, MARIAM ON 11/18/2022
Date: November 18, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.