Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Balboa Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Katherine S. Agbayani, Marisa D. Poulos, Michelle A. Chiongson, against Carmine Louis Liberatore, C Liberatore Llc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
This complaint is filed by Balboa Capital Corporation against C Liberatore LLC, Carmine Louis Liberatore Jr., and Does 1 through 10. Balboa Capital Corporation alleges that it is owed at least $252,827.60 by the defendants. Balboa Capital Corporation...
Complaint
Date: August 22, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 09/14/2022
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/07/2022.
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 09/09/2022
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/09/2022
Date: November 09, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 09/19/2022
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 10/24/2022
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 12/16/2022
Date: December 16, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.