Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Galina Lifanova-Kolev, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Abella Felarca Carroll, William J. Carroll, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint document appears to be a court filing in the Superior Court of California, County of Orange. However, the extracted text contains a lot of noise and invalid characters, making it difficult to determine the specific details of the compl...
Complaint
Date: August 22, 2022COMPLAINT FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/06/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: February 07, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CARROLL, ABELLA FELARCA; CARROLL, WILLIAM J. ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARROLL, ABELLA FELARCA; CARROLL, WILLIAM J. ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 01/11/2023
Date: January 11, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 01/11/2023
Date: January 11, 2023DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY CARROLL, ABELLA FELARCA; CARROLL, WILLIAM J. ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LIFANOVA-KOLEV, GALINA ON 10/12/2022
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY CARROLL, ABELLA FELARCA; CARROLL, WILLIAM J. ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.