Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Erma Parker, filed a(n) Misc Complaints - Other case against Country Oaks Partners, Llc, Sun Mar Management Services, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
CategoryMisc Complaints - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 07/13/2022
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 07/13/2022
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 07/13/2022
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 07/21/2022
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 07/14/2022
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00MOTION FOR PREFERENCE FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 08/08/2022
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 08/30/2022
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNTRY OAKS PARTNERS, LLC; SUN MAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES ON 08/15/2022
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 08/30/2022
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 08/30/2022
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/13/2022
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/13/2022
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL) FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/13/2022
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM) FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/13/2022
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/01/2022
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/02/2022
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/02/2022
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY COUNTRY OAKS PARTNERS, LLC; SUN MAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES ON 11/04/2022
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR PREFERENCE 11/18/2022 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/18/2022 02:06:00 PM.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 12/12/2022
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE 12/09/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 11/21/2022
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21247037 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/21/2022 11:07:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 12/22/2022
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTRY OAKS PARTNERS, LLC; SUN MAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES ON 12/23/2022
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/23/2022 09:54:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY COUNTRY OAKS PARTNERS, LLC; SUN MAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES ON 01/06/2023
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 01/06/2023
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COUNTRY OAKS PARTNERS, LLC ON 12/21/2022
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SUN MAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES ON 12/21/2022
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 01/09/2023
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023.
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 01/12/2023
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 01/12/2023
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/09/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PARKER, ERMA ON 01/23/2023
Date: January 23, 2023PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/06/2023
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2023
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/17/2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.