Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Richard Elias, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against American Financial Network, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 03/23/2022
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 03/23/2022
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 03/29/2022
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 03/23/2022
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 05/17/2022
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO NICO DOURBETAS EFFECTIVE 05/20/2022.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. ON 05/12/2022
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 04/04/2022
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 08/01/2022
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. ON 08/12/2022
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. ON 11/03/2022
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 11/04/2022
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ELIAS, RICHARD ON 08/04/2023
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. ON 11/22/2022
Date: November 22, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/21/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/21/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: August 21, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. ON 08/04/2023
Date: August 04, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.