Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MISSION RECRUITING, LLC VS. LAW OFFICES OF JASON ESTAVILLO, P.C.
A Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by Mission Recruiting, Llc, against Law Offices Of Jason Estavillo, P.C., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 17, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 12, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Nico Dourbetas;Category
BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MISSION RECRUITING, LLC ON 05/12/2022 |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 31155997 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2022 11:27:24 AM. | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO NICO DOURBETAS EFFECTIVE 05/20/2022. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1964807 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2022 04:38:10 PM. | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION RECRUITING, LLC ON 03/17/2022 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 03/17/2022. | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13022532 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12850517. |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION RECRUITING, LLC ON 03/17/2022 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY MISSION RECRUITING, LLC ON 03/17/2022 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/22/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Robert James Moss |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 41311053 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2022 03:10:33 PM. |