Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Immigrant Rights Defense Council, Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Josephine Abreu, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2022 |
CategoryNon-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COMPLAINT FILED BY IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC ON 01/12/2022
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC ON 01/12/2022
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC ON 01/12/2022
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00DEMURRER FILED BY ABREU, JOSEPHINE ON 02/22/2022
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022.
Date: June 01, 2022PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ABREU, JOSEPHINE ON 05/13/2022
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT OC GENERATED
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC ON 06/01/2022
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC ON 06/09/2022
Date: June 09, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.