Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mark Garcia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert James Moss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, MARK ON 01/10/2022
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, MARK ON 01/10/2022
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, MARK ON 01/10/2022
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/09/2022 09:27:00 AM.
Date: June 09, 2022DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 02/25/2022
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2022 02:47:00 PM.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GARCIA, MARK ON 01/12/2022
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 05/25/2022
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO NICO DOURBETAS EFFECTIVE 05/20/2022.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2022PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GARCIA, MARK ON 06/02/2022
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/25/2022
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 02/25/2022
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.