Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Debara Graham, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Ayzar Inc., Brookhollow Business Park, Brookhollow Office Park Association, Jvs Property Santa Ana, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Theodore R. Howard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 01/11/2022
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 12/29/2021
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 02/23/2022
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 04/01/2022
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 04/01/2022
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31123709 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/18/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 04/28/2022
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 05/05/2022
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 05/12/2022
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 05/23/2022
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BROOKHOLLOW OFFICE PARK ASSOCIATION ON 05/26/2022
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BROOKHOLLOW OFFICE PARK ASSOCIATION; AYZAR INC. ON 05/16/2022
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AYZAR INC.; BROOKHOLLOW OFFICE PARK ASSOCIATION ON 05/26/2022
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/20/2022
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/30/2022
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2022
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/30/2022
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/02/2022
Date: November 02, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 09/30/2022 03:54:00 PM.
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/18/2022
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/20/2022
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IN-INTERVENTION) FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/20/2022
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY GRAHAM, DEBARA ON 03/07/2023
Date: March 07, 2023E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21281473 REJECTED.
Date: May 05, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.