Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Robert T Grant, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 07/24/2023) RECEIVED ON 05/05/2023.
Date: May 05, 2023DOCUMENT - OTHER (CASE SUMMARY) FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/06/2023
Date: February 06, 2023REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/06/2023
Date: February 06, 2023JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/06/2023
Date: February 06, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 06/10/2022
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/06/2023
Date: February 06, 2023DECLARATION - OTHER (ATTORNEYS FEE) FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/06/2023
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/27/2021
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/06/2023
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (IMAGED DOCUMENTS) RECEIVED ON 02/06/2023.
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.