Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Fabienne Marneau, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 06/15/2022
Date: June 15, 2022PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/27/2021
Date: September 27, 2021PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/28/2021
Date: September 28, 2021COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.