Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Nurjahan Acosta, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY ACOSTA, NURJAHAN ON 11/15/2021
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 09/20/2021
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 08/05/2022
Date: August 05, 2022NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 11/04/2022
Date: November 04, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ACOSTA, NURJAHAN ON 12/22/2021
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/12/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: October 31, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.