Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Maria M Ramirez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 09/28/2021
Date: September 28, 2021DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 12/13/2021
Date: December 13, 2021REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 12/13/2021
Date: December 13, 2021REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 12/13/2021
Date: December 13, 2021JUDGMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 12/13/2021
Date: December 13, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.