Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jeng K Park, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/29/2021
Date: June 29, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/29/2021
Date: June 29, 2021COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/29/2021
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/29/2021
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/08/2021
Date: July 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.