We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n)
Insurance Coverage -
Insurance
case
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Nathan R. Scott presiding.
Filing Date
April 08, 2021
Category
Insurance Coverage
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Case Events for
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Vs. Gerardo Rodriguez
Date
Type
Description
September 13, 2021
Hearing
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SCOTT
April 26, 2021
Docket Event
NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/26/2021
Get Document
April 26, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 21011241 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2021 02:52:40 PM.
April 23, 2021
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/23/2021
Get Document
April 23, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 21010398 RECEIVED ON 04/23/2021 09:26:07 AM.
April 12, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41179187 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2021 11:15:33 AM.
April 12, 2021
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Get Document
April 12, 2021
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12871061 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12698734.
Get Document
April 08, 2021
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/08/2021
Get Document
April 08, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/08/2021
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.