Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff Yelena Ilnitskaya moved to compel further responses from Defendants Assent Mortgage, LLC, Nepka, Inc., and Mahyar Kazemi as to the first sets of requests for production of documents. Plainti...
Judge: Deborah C SERVINO |
|
February 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing on demurrer to answer and motion to strike answer off-calendar. Notice of withdrawal filed 2/29/2021.
Judge: Deborah C SERVINO |
|
January 22, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing on demurrers and motions to strike complaint off-calendar. Demurrers and motions to strike rendered moot by 1/7/2021 filing of first amended answers by moving Defendants.
Judge: Deborah C SERVINO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.