Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Attorney’s Fees TENTATIVE RULING: Defendants David and Maryann Johndrow’s Motion for Fees The lodestar method for calculating attorneys’ fees applies to any statutory attorneys’ fees award,...
Judge: Fred W SLAUGHTER |
|
April 21, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Reconsideration TENTATIVE RULING: Plaintiff & Cross-Defendant Irvine Terrace Community Association’s Motion for Reconsideration of February 11, 2021, Order is DENIED. Challenged Order On Fe...
Judge: Fred W SLAUGHTER |
|
April 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Attorney Fees TENTATIVE RULING: Defendants David and Maryann Johndrow’s Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (the “Motion”) is GRANTED, with the amount(s) to be determined at a future hearing...
Judge: Fred W SLAUGHTER |
|
March 17, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant’s Demurrer to Amended Complaint TENTATIVE RULING: Defendants David and Maryann Johndrow’s Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint is OVERRULED. Within fifteen (15) days, Defendants shall fil...
Judge: Fred W SLAUGHTER |
|
March 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion No. 1: Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint: Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Irvine Terrance Com. Assn.’s Demurrer is OVERRULED. Johndrows have properly alleged the Third Cause of Action. Th...
Judge: Sheila FELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.