We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lucia Perez ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
Shawn Nguyen ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with James L. Crandall presiding.
Filing Date
June 04, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 12, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Other Parties
Cervantes Hodges Law Firm (Attorney)
Case Events for
Lucia Perez v. Shawn Nguyen
Date
Type
Description
April 07, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41168860 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2021 02:05:29 PM.
March 15, 2021
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
March 15, 2021
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PEREZ, LUCIA ON 03/15/2021
Get Document
March 15, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
March 09, 2021
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: James L. Crandall
March 09, 2021
Docket Event
THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.
March 09, 2021
Docket Event
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 03/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Get Document
January 06, 2021
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: James L. Crandall
January 06, 2021
Docket Event
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 01/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Get Document
January 06, 2021
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B CONTINUED TO 03/09/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.