Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to October 4, 2021. No further briefing without order of this court.
Judge: David HOFFER |
|
June 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Status Conference
Judge: David HOFFER |
|
February 11, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Petitioner City of Costa Mesa 1. Motion to Appoint Receiver 2. Status Conference ** OFF-CALENDAR**
Judge: Layne H. MELZER |
|
October 02, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion to Appoint Receiver The Court in in receipt of Mr. Beatty’s report and will hear from Mr. Beatty and the parties.
Judge: James DI CESARE |
|
August 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion to Appoint Receiver The property at issue here is 1963 Wallace Avenue, Costa Mesa, and is identified by Assessor's Parcel Number 422-271-10 (hereinafter "Subject Property"). It was built in 195...
Judge: James DI CESARE |
|
July 31, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion to Appoint Receiver This matter is Continued to 8/14/20 per 7/15/20 Minute Order.
Judge: James DI CESARE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.