Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Ronald Morris, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with James L. Crandall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Crandall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 01/20/2021
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/26/2020.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/11/2020.
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/13/2020
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/13/2020
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (OF HEARING) FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1744470 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 11/23/2020
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 11/20/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 08/26/2020.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER (TO CONTINUE HEARING) FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 10/08/2020
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/14/2020 03:33:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 01/07/2021
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00STIPULATION TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS RECEIVED ON 01/15/2021.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/08/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41215330 REJECTED.
Date: July 13, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/28/2021 03:15:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/08/2021
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31036175 REJECTED.
Date: July 12, 2021E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41163802 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 07/01/2021
Date: July 01, 2021REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 07/15/2021
Date: July 15, 2021PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/04/2021.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MORRIS, RONALD ON 02/11/2021
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.