Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant’s demurrers are SUSTAINED with leave to amend, except as set forth below. The motion to strike is treated as MOOT. Demurrer to the 1st COA for Breach of Contract is sustained with leave to a...
Judge: David HOFFER |
|
March 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff Suzanne Marshall’s motion to compel further responses to a request for production (“RFP”) directed to defendant Timothy Marshall is GRANTED. The subject RFPs 2 through 7 are fairly targeted ...
Judge: David HOFFER |
|
February 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued
Judge: David HOFFER |
|
October 26, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Demurrers to the First Amended Complaint are, in part, SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and, in part, OVERRULED as set forth more fully below. The Motion to strike is deemed MOOT. The amended complaint i...
Judge: David HOFFER |
|
September 28, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to 10/26/2020
Judge: David HOFFER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.