Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brian Hixson, Jaime Flores, John Apodaca, Robert Stonescu, Scott Olander, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Toyota Of Huntington Beach, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Walter P. Schwarm presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/06/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 12/31/2019.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OC
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY TOYOTA OF HUNTINGTON BEACH ON 06/02/2020
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/06/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/05/2020
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/02/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/05/2020
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/05/2020
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/08/2020
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY TOYOTA OF HUNTINGTON BEACH ON 09/09/2020
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/09/2020 09:02:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY TOYOTA OF HUNTINGTON BEACH ON 11/30/2020
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/20/2020
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/08/2021
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELOCATION
Date: July 29, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY OLANDER, SCOTT ON 12/14/2020
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2021 04:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY TOYOTA OF HUNTINGTON BEACH ON 01/13/2021
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 01/14/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: January 14, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 07/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.