Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel Mendoza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Xochilt Ramos, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Derek W. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAMOS, XOCHILT ON 03/06/2020
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 02/13/2020
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY RAMOS, XOCHILT ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 03/17/2020
Date: March 17, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 03/17/2020
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 02/13/2020
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 01/10/2020
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RAMOS, XOCHILT ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/19/2020 10:07:00 AM.
Date: March 19, 2020DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY RAMOS, XOCHILT ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 12/31/2019.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 12/29/2020
Date: December 29, 2020CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2020COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, DANIEL ON 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.