Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Progressive Direct Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Blanca Rosa Palomo, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/30/2019
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/16/2019
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/04/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/22/2020
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/16/2019
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/16/2019
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3925948 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: May 21, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/17/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/24/2020
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/04/2021
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/17/2021
Date: May 17, 2021PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/14/2021.
Date: May 14, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/10/2020
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AMENDED) FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 05/12/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/02/2021
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.