Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pamlea Brooks, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Jeremy Edward Hicks, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 10/04/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 10/04/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 10/04/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (GRANTED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/08/2019
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/04/2019.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2949119 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 10/15/2020
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 10/16/2020
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 10/16/2020
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 02/24/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: February 25, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1837710 REJECTED.
Date: April 20, 2021PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BROOKS, PAMLEA ON 12/22/2020
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1838490 REJECTED.
Date: April 22, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/23/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.