Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff Raquel Moron (“Plaintiff”) moves for an order compelling: 1. AER Surfer, Inc. to provide further responses to RFP, Set 2 2. AER Surfer, Inc. to provide further responses to SROG, Set 1 3. Av...
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
August 23, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion to Compel Answers to Special Interrogatories 2. Motion to Compel Production both filed by Raquel Moron on 6/15/21 Continued to 08/30/2021
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
August 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories filed by Raquel Moron on 6/14/21 Continued to 08/30/2021
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
June 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion to Quash Subpoena to Wells Fargo 2. Motion to Quash Subpoena to Wescom Central Credit Union 3. Motion to Quash Subpoena 4. Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories 5. Motio...
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
June 21, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion to Quash Subpoena 2. Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories 3. Motion to Compel Production 4. Motion to Compel Production all filed by Raquel Moron MOTIONS CONTINUED TO J...
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
November 01, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Raquel Moron Plaintiff Raquel Moron’s Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. California courts generally allow great libera...
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
September 28, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Demurrer to Amended Complaint 2. Motion to Strike both filed by AER Surfer, Inc., Veronica Lopez, El Pachuco, LLC, Salvador Avila, Avila'S El Ranchito Grill, Inc. on 2/6/20 and 2/7/20 Continued to ...
Judge: Linda MARKS |
|
March 09, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion to Compel Production filed by Raquel Moron Plaintiff Raquel Moron’s Motion to Compel Defendant Avila’s El Ranchito Grill, Inc.’s Compliance to Plaintiff’s Request for Production of Documents...
Judge: Linda MARKS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.