Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jose Farias, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Long & Delis, Sentinel Restaurant And Hospitality Gr, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Randall J. Sherman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 09/23/2019
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 10/04/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 10/02/2019
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 10/30/2020
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 05/17/2019.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 07/30/2021
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2022
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE OSC) FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 09/29/2022
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/30/2022
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 09/30/2022
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/10/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/14/2019 04:02:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 09/23/2019
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 09/27/2019
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 09/27/2019
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 07/10/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/04/2020 03:13:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 03/29/2021
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023OPPOSITION FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/07/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/30/2021 11:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 09/30/2022
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 02/14/2022
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/04/2021 03:27:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 10/20/2021
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 06/09/2022
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/15/2022 02:34:00 PM.
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/21/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 12/22/2022
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/27/2023 10:10:00 AM.
Date: June 27, 2023E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21216623 REJECTED.
Date: December 30, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY SENTINEL RESTAURANT AND HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ON 09/30/2022
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 12/30/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: December 30, 2022REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY FARIAS, JOSE ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.