Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion to Vacate The Motion by Cross-Complainant Alan Dale Dickinson (“Cross-Complainant”) to vacate the awards of sanctions and costs previously imposed against him is DENIED. On 11/30/20, the Court ...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
February 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication – granted The Motion by Cross-Defendants Golden Rain Foundation of Laguna Woods and Village Management Services, Inc. (collectively, “Cross-Defendants”)...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
December 21, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1) Motion – “Opposition” to Sanctions and/or Postponement of Fees - DENIED 2) Motion to Vacate Sanctions or Postpone Payment of Sanction - DENIED 3) Motion to Compel Answers to Form Interrogatories - ...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
November 30, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1) Motion for Sanctions 2) Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (1)MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Before the Court is a Motion by Cross-Complainant Alan Dale Dickinson (“Dickinson” or “Cross-Complainant”) ) against Cr...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
September 21, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1) Motion for Sanctions 2) Motion to Compel Further Reponses to Special Interrogatories Motion for Sanctions Cross-Defendants Golden Rain Foundation of Laguna Woods, Village Management Services, Inc.,...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
August 24, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1) Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record -- GRANTED 2) Trial Setting Conference – PARTIES TO APPEAR The Motion by Karin Tan, Esq. (“Counsel”) to be relieved as counsel of record for Cross-Complai...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
August 10, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings The Motion by Cross-Defendants Brian Gruner, Jennifer Murphy, Marcy Sheinwold, and Beth Perak for judgment on the pleadings as to Cross-Complainant Alan Dickinson’...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
|
July 20, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1) Motion to Compel Deposition (Oral or Written) 2) Order to Show Cause re: Monetary Sanctions – no tentative ruling; the party subject to the OSC shall appear Motion to Compel Cross-Complainant to At...
Judge: Martha K. GOODING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.