Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Sheila B. Fell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSheila B. Fell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/10/2018
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/10/2018
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 09/10/2018.
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1539783 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 10/18/2018
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 10/17/2018
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/17/2018
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 11/21/2018
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 02/05/2019
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 10/24/2018
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 03/12/2019 03:14:00 PM.
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/13/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 05/16/2019
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION 06/17/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 08/02/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 05/16/2019
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 12/13/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 06/10/2019
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION 04/22/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2019
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA; MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 04/12/2019
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 06/25/2019
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 05/14/2019 03:24:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/03/2019
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 05/16/2019
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/04/2019
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA; MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 04/12/2019
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 05/16/2019
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 10/18/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA FELL EFFECTIVE 06/13/2019.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/04/2019
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 04/25/2019
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 04/12/2019
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 05/09/2019
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 05/13/2019
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR REVIEW HEARING 01/10/2020 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/11/2020
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/11/2020
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/06/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/06/2020
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2020
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 10/05/2020
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (MOTION- OTHER) FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 10/14/2020
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/11/2020
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH PITCHESS ORDER) FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 09/11/2020
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 10/05/2020
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/18/2020
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 10/14/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 12/16/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 01/05/2021 01:47:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 01/04/2021
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/22/2020
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 12/16/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO FRED SLAUGHTER EFFECTIVE 03/01/2021.
Date: February 11, 2021EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 01/04/2021
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/16/2020 08:14:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 11/25/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/09/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2020
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 11/04/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 01/06/2021
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/22/2020
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 02/25/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 03/19/2019
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 03/19/2019
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 03/19/2019
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 03/19/2019
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 03/19/2019
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MOISE, CLAUDIA ON 02/06/2019
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/06/2021
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2021
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.