Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Calvary Chapel Yorba Linda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Calvary Baptist Church Of Yorba Linda, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Sherri L. Honer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2018 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 09/07/2018
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 09/11/2018
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 09/07/2018.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 09/07/2018
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/04/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 12/21/2018
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/06/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/05/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/08/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALVARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF YORBA LINDA ON 12/20/2019
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY OF RECORD FILED BY CALVARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF YORBA LINDA ON 12/20/2019
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/07/2020 03:44:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 01/27/2020
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY CALVARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF YORBA LINDA ON 01/31/2020
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 01/27/2020
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/07/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 02/13/2020
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 12/08/2020
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR 12/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2020
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CALVARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF YORBA LINDA ON 07/28/2020
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2020
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALVARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF YORBA LINDA ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR 03/19/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2020
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 09/10/2021
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY CALVARY CHAPEL YORBA LINDA ON 09/29/2021
Date: September 29, 2021PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021
Date: September 24, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/13/2021 11:40:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.