Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Javier Elizalde, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/29/2018
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/29/2018
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/15/2018
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/29/2018
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ELIZALDE, JAVIER ON 05/23/2018
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ELIZALDE, JAVIER ON 05/23/2018
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/15/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/04/2019
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ELIZALDE, JAVIER ON 02/01/2019
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ELIZALDE, JAVIER ON 02/01/2019
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL 09/24/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/15/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/18/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED BY ELIZALDE, JAVIER REJECTED ON 11/18/2019.
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 08/05/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/15/2019
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/15/2019
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/16/2020
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/28/2020
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL 12/02/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/15/2019.
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ELIZALDE, JAVIER ON 11/15/2019
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/29/2020
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/04/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/19/2021
Date: March 19, 2021DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.