Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Larry William Karkkainen, filed a(n) Civil case against County Of Orange, Birgitt Walpus, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Deborah C. Servino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 07/06/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 08/16/2018
Date: August 16, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 06/21/2018
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/09/2018.
Date: August 09, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KARKKAINEN, LARRY WILLIAM ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KARKKAINEN, LARRY WILLIAM ON 06/08/2018
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY KARKKAINEN, LARRY WILLIAM ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 03/02/2018.
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/06/2018
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KARKKAINEN, LARRY WILLIAM ON 04/26/2018
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 08/06/2018
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KARKKAINEN, LARRY WILLIAM ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 08/08/2018
Date: August 08, 2018MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/08/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/05/2018
Date: September 05, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY KARKKAINEN, LARRY WILLIAM ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 07/06/2018
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 06/29/2018
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WALPUS, BIRGITT; COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 06/29/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.