Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Yolanda Montiel, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Donna Patrucci, Frank Hill, Garden Grove Hospital Medical Center, Gertrude Da Jose, Jeffrey Chu, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Martha K. Gooding presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2018 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 02/26/2018
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 02/26/2018
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 02/26/2018
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/16/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/02/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 04/10/2019
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/11/2020 08:56:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2018
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/02/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 02/26/2018.
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 08/05/2020
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/07/2020 04:29:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/26/2019 07:53:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/01/2018 03:07:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2018-09-20 15:49:00.0.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 08/31/2018
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/06/2018 02:05:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 09/12/2018
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/10/2018 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2018.
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00PREFILING ORDER-VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 10/01/2018
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 11/26/2018 10:10:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 11/16/2018
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 01/11/2019
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/19/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/19/2018 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/14/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/04/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 04/10/2019
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NAVAREZ, JOSEFINA ON 04/10/2019
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/15/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 05/15/2019 03:06:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/10/2019 08:18:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMON) FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 06/05/2019
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/29/2019 02:18:00 PM.
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 07/22/2019
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 07/22/2019
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 06/10/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/12/2019 11:04:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 07/22/2019
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2791714 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/15/2020 10:21:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 09/09/2021
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/31/2021 02:42:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/23/2020 02:19:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/14/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 12/02/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: December 03, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/08/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 01/07/2021 03:43:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 06/30/2021 02:21:00 PM.
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1927891 REJECTED.
Date: December 15, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/14/2021 03:23:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/30/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 09/09/2021
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY MONTIEL, YOLANDA ON 12/10/2021
Date: December 10, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/03/2021 11:25:00 AM.
Date: November 03, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.