Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against South Coast Auto House, Inc., Mahmood Forootan, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Joe T. Perez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time110 days |
REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/18/2018
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/10/2018
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/18/2018
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/29/2018
Date: May 29, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 03/19/2018
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 04/19/2018
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 03/28/2018
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 02/21/2018.
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 05/18/2018.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: May 31, 2018PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/18/2018.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 05/18/2018
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/11/18) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2018.
Date: June 11, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.