Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Najib K. Khoury, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Aaron Delatorre, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Gregory H. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2018 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Time To Trial160 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions393 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time394 days |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 01/30/2018
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 06/21/2018
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 01/30/2018.
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 02/27/2018
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 01/30/2018
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/09/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 06/13/2018
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 06/21/2018
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 01/30/2018
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/09/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 10/15/2018
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 12/20/2018
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 11/29/2018
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2018
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 01/11/2019
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 12/21/2018
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4917372 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4912310 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 01/08/2019
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/17/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3739479 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/07/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY DELATORRE, AARON ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 02/19/2019.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 02/19/2019
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1592751 REJECTED.
Date: February 28, 2019MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/26/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: February 27, 2019MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/21/2019 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4938946 REJECTED.
Date: February 26, 2019REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KHOURY, NAJIB K. ON 02/27/2019
Date: February 27, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.