Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dorothy Nguyen, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against The Mitchell Gold Co., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Peter J. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2018 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 01/09/2018
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 02/07/2018.
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 01/22/2018
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/05/2018 03:56:00 PM.
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/06/2018 08:10:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 01/09/2018
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 01/09/2018
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 01/09/2018.
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/22/2018 08:42:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 03/22/2018
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/19/2018
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/08/2018 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE MITCHELL GOLD CO. ON 04/02/2018
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT) FILED BY THE MITCHELL GOLD CO. ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/05/2018
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER-CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 06/12/2018
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/12/2018
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/13/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 06/05/2018
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/12/2018 10:55:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 06/05/2018
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 06/13/2018
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO PETER WILSON EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (AND RELEASE) RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019.
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY ORDER) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 10/10/2018
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/27/2018 04:22:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 10/09/2018
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY THE MITCHELL GOLD CO. ON 03/06/2019
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 07/24/2019
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 01/15/2019
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/15/2019
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/04/2019
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 12/04/2019
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL 09/12/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/14/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/08/2019
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 04/08/2019
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (AMENDMENT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 04/08/2019
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 01/31/2019
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 04/18/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 04/22/2019
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1586439 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4956612 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 04/26/2019
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER (FOR FINAL APPROVAL) FILED BY THE MITCHELL GOLD CO. ON 08/02/2019
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/15/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3816115 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/22/2019
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00PRELIMINARY APPROVAL AND PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 07/24/2019
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3816173 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/24/2019
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF ANDY MORRISON) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 07/24/2019
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO ORDER) FILED BY THE MITCHELL GOLD CO. ON 09/09/2019
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2020
Date: November 03, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 11/12/2020
Date: November 12, 2020MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/09/2020 02:31:00 PM.
Date: November 09, 2020JUDGMENT (FINAL APPROVAL ORDER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/05/2019
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2020MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL 12/05/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY NGUYEN, DOROTHY ON 11/03/2020
Date: November 03, 2020NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1691689 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.