Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Truc L. Dong, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Takano International Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with William D. Claster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Claster Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/27/2017
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 11/15/2017
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/27/2017
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/27/2017
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 10/27/2017.
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-11-02 09:28:00.0.
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/23/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TAKANO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ON 01/16/2018
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 11/28/2017
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/17/2018
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 01/23/2018
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/20/2018
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY TAKANO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ON 02/13/2018
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/30/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/16/2018
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/09/2018
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (RE: CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 25, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 06/21/2018
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/23/2018
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/17/2018
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY TAKANO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ON 04/17/2018
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 11/21/2018
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/19/2019 09:53:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 04/25/2018
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/05/2019
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 04/25/2018
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 04/25/2018
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (ALLOWING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 04/18/2018
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 06/20/2018
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 06/18/2018
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/17/2018
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 09/17/2018
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4934118 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 05/10/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 09/18/2018
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/29/2018 11:03:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/05/2019
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY ORDER) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 09/16/2019
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL 12/20/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF NATHALIE HERNANDEZ) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/05/2019
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/05/2019
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 02/05/2019
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/21/2019 02:34:00 PM.
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY TAKANO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ON 04/29/2019
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 03/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (FURTHER DECLARATION OF SIMON KWAK) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 05/07/2019
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 05/23/2019
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/29/2020 10:17:00 AM.
Date: July 29, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 08/26/2019
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF TRUC L. DONG) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2868949 REJECTED.
Date: December 23, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF JESSICA L. CAMPBELL) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3848508 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 12/05/2019
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL 11/15/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 12/19/2019
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/19/2019
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2020ORDER AFTER HEARING (ORDER/JUDGMENT) FILED BY DONG, TRUC L. ON 12/30/2019
Date: December 30, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.