Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Franklin David Rose, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Franklin David Rose, Sandy Cummings, Tamora L. Ledbetter, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Gregory H. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory H. Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 05/15/2017
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 05/15/2017
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 05/15/2017
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 05/15/2017.
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/16/2017
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 05/26/2017
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY ON 06/21/2017
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 06/26/2017
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 08/24/2017
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/28/2017 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: MEET AND CONFER) FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 08/24/2017
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 11/06/2017
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 08/29/2017 10:49:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 09/21/2017
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/06/2017
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 10/03/2017
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/25/2017 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 11/06/2017
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO EXPARTE) FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 11/13/2017
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 11/14/2017
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 01/18/2018
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 11/14/2017
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2610003 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 11/15/2017
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 01/18/2018
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/20/2017 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 01/23/2018
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/22/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER (SECOND) FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 04/03/2018
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 04/03/2018
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2018
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 02/20/2018
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2018
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/26/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 02/20/2018
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/26/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 10/09/2018
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 11/26/2018
Date: November 26, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 05/30/2018
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/09/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/15/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 22, 2018MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 10/04/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSE, FRANKLIN DAVID ON 05/22/2018
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CUMMINGS, SANDY; LEDBETTER, TAMORA L. ON 10/09/2018
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.