Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Univax, Llc, filed a(n) Fraud case against Gerry B. Berg, Molecuvax, Inc., Therapeutic Solutions International, Inc., Timothy Dixon, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Andrew P. Banks presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew P. Banks Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2017 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2017CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS
Date: May 18, 2017CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNIVAX, LLC ON 02/23/2017
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAIL - OUT OF STATE FILED BY UNIVAX, LLC ON 03/15/2017
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/17/2017
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/23/2017 02:04:00 PM.
Date: March 23, 2017E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3514147 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY UNIVAX, LLC ON 03/15/2017
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNIVAX, LLC ON 02/22/2017
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY UNIVAX, LLC ON 02/22/2017
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRANSFER
Date: April 27, 2017CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/22/2017.
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.