Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion for Summary Adjudication 2. Status Conference Defendants JTH, the Proskys and their Trust, move for summary adjudication of the Third Cause of Action for Slander of Title and the Fifth Cause...
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
July 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion for Summary Adjudication 2. Status Conference
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
April 30, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
1. Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication Continued to 7/9/2021 2. Status Conference Status Conference remains on calendar on 04/30/2021
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
September 11, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
After an IDC, this matter was continued to 9-18-2020
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
September 01, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant/Cross-Defendant Stewart Title’s Motion to Compel PMK Deposition and Request for Sanctions
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
July 17, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
1.Defendant Crystal Cove Advisors RE Inc.’s (CCA) Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint (“Complaint”) 2.Status Conference The court overrules defendant CCA’s demurrer to the 3rd and 4th causes of actio...
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
June 19, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to 7-17-2020
Judge: Glenda SANDERS |
|
July 25, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING: The unopposed motions by plaintiff Gainquick, LLC to permit pretrial discovery of the financial condition of defendants Paul Garcia and Mark Attalla are granted.
Judge: Frederick HORN |
|
June 27, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING: The motion filed by defendant Alan Rothman to strike portions of the Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Gainquick LLC is DENIED. Defendant did not file a declaration showing...
Judge: Frederick HORN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.