Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Timothy Gregory, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Tommy Bahama R&R Holdings, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with William D. Claster presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time116 days |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/16/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/14/2016 10:12:00 AM.
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2516356 REJECTED.
Date: December 15, 2016NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 11/07/2016
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TOMMY BAHAMA R&R HOLDINGS, INC. ON 11/16/2016.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 09/21/2016
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2516980 REJECTED.
Date: December 20, 2016CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 08/26/2016.
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (OF DISMISSAL) FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 12/19/2016
Date: December 19, 2016CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2016
Date: December 14, 2016NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GREGORY, TIMOTHY ON 10/04/2016.
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.