Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Martinez vs. American Solar
A Civil case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Gregory H. Lewis presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
civil
Case Duration
8 months and 13 days
Time To Trial
5 months and 4 days
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3521133 REJECTED. |
|
May 08, 2017 | Tentative Ruling | Motion: Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint. Moving Party Plaintiff Olive Martinez. Off-Calendar: Dismissal filed 4/26/17.
Judge: Gregory LEWIS |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3538609 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2017 03:40:27 PM. | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 04/26/2017 |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED Cross-Complaint DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Demurrer TO AMENDED Cross-Complaint SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2017 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C26 AT .
Judge: Gregory H. Lewis |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Demurrer TO Cross-Complaint SCHEDULED FOR 05/15/2017 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory H. Lewis |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123048 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11946851. |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3521093 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017 12:29:34 PM. | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12122977 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11946780. |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2537920 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017 01:18:03 PM. | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Demurrer TO Cross-Complaint FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 03/13/2017 |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 03/13/2017 |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Demurrer TO AMENDED Cross-Complaint FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 03/13/2017 |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017 |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4680968 RECEIVED ON 02/20/2017 07:11:04 PM. | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 02/21/2017 |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4676310 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2017 07:26:08 PM. | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED Cross-Complaint (FIRST) FILED BY AMERICAN SOLAR DIRECT INC. ON 02/09/2017 |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/30/2017 08:30:00 AM. |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory H. Lewis |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory H. Lewis |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26. | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3503393 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2017 12:48:51 PM. | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26. | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN SOLAR DIRECT INC. ON 01/25/2017 |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER (A FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S Cross-Complaint) FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 01/25/2017 |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4667523 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2017 08:47:00 AM. | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4662863 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2017 08:46:25 PM. | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 01/17/2017 |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING (EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO Cross-Complaint) FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 12/15/2016 |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/12/2016 08:30:00 AM. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/30/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory H. Lewis |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 01/30/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12075020 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11898984. |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2016. |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND) FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 12/09/2016 |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4647185 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2016 12:02:43 PM. | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4633664 RECEIVED ON 11/10/2016 10:54:41 AM. | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12060855 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11884820. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FILED BY AMERICAN SOLAR DIRECT INC. ON 11/10/2016 |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint FILED BY AMERICAN SOLAR DIRECT INC. ON 11/10/2016 |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3466554 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2016 10:10:57 AM. | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 10/11/2016 |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory H. Lewis |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4597693 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2016 06:03:59 PM. | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021386 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845411. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 08/26/2016. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY MARTINEZ, OLIVE ON 08/26/2016 |
|