Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CARLOS VALLE VS. DOGGIE DAYCARE...AND MORE, INC.
A Pi/Pd/Wd - Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Linda S. Marks presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Richard Lee;Category
PI/PD/WD - OTHER
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 1 month and 2 days
Time To Trial
7 months and 14 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1541136 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2018 10:56:01 AM. | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO Cross-Complaint) FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 09/17/2018 |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/06/2018 09:00:00 AM. |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/11/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C32. | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 10/11/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1529947 REJECTED. |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (COMPLAINT) FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 08/20/2018 |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3700405 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2018 11:57:37 AM. | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/13/2018 10:54:00 AM. |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C32. | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3685845 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2018 03:47:32 PM. | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2687732 REJECTED. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 07/09/2018 |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 07/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM. | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO Richard LEE EFFECTIVE 04/02/2018. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4820078 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018 12:47:47 PM. | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 03/02/2018 |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (FOR STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 03/01/2018 |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 03/01/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4820048 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018 12:03:22 PM. | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018 |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - OTHER FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 02/28/2018 |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1473252 REJECTED. |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1473525 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018 12:47:46 PM. | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12307440 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12131180. |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 02/28/2018 |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12300410 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12124173. |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3636594 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2018 12:48:40 PM. | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 02/14/2018 |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2018. |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 02/02/2018 09:00:00 AM. |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4809383 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2018 01:00:33 PM. | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED ON 01/26/2018. | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3630182 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2018 11:53:04 AM. | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3628856 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2018 03:05:18 PM. | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 01/23/2018 |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 11/16/2017 |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3608336 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017 09:48:20 AM. | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4711236 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2017 11:11:43 AM. | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 04/19/2017 |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/11/2017 08:45:00 AM. |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C10. | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C10. | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 03/22/2017 |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2540988 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2017 04:33:35 PM. | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3525153 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2017 01:50:41 PM. | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 03/22/2017 |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 03/10/2017 |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2537520 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2017 01:12:10 PM. | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/28/2017 08:45:00 AM. |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4686350 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017 08:49:40 AM. | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 03/02/2017 |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/11/2017 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 02/08/2017 |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4675240 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2017 02:02:09 PM. | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4664173 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017 03:42:06 PM. | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/17/2017 08:45:00 AM. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 01/18/2017 |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 02/28/2017 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 12/30/2016 |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3494839 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016 02:17:49 PM. | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 12/27/2016 |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1360853 RECEIVED ON 12/27/2016 10:59:10 AM. | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/17/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 01/17/2017 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/28/2016 02:00:00 PM. |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12066948 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11890898. |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2511616 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016 09:38:59 AM. | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOGGIE DAY CARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 11/23/2016 |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4639468 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2016 04:37:26 PM. | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint FILED BY DOGGIE DAYCARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 11/22/2016 |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FILED BY DOGGIE DAYCARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 11/22/2016 |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DOGGIE DAYCARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 11/22/2016 |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DOGGIE DAYCARE...AND MORE, INC. ON 11/22/2016 |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 11/14/2016 |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 11/14/2016 |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12061204 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11885169. |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2508683 RECEIVED ON 11/11/2016 10:59:49 AM. | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3478737 RECEIVED ON 11/11/2016 11:05:49 AM. | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 10/24/2016 |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4625138 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2016 01:54:26 PM. | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/28/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Linda S. Marks |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 08/26/2016. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VALLE, CARLOS ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2489086 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2016 03:12:53 PM. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021243 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845271. |
|