Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time271 days |
REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 11/16/2016
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (CCP 1033) FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (& ORDER) FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 11/16/2016
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED ON 4/28/2017) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2017.
Date: April 27, 2017COMPLAINT FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 03/01/2017
Date: March 01, 2017DECLARATION - OTHER (& ORDER) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2016.
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/09/2016.
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY A.M. CASTLE & CO./CASTLE METALS ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.