Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions249 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time249 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 08/26/2016.
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY SIENKO, FRED ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: February 23, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIENKO, FRED ON 11/22/2016
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIENKO, FRED ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION
Date: February 28, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.